Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/24/1997
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/24/1997
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 09/24/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 09/24/1997
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/03/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/09/1997
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 11/09/1997