Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 07/31/1997
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 07/31/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 07/31/1997
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 07/31/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/03/1997
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 09/03/1997
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 09/03/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/26/1997
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 09/30/1997
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/30/1997
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 10/08/1997
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 10/28/1997
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/26/1998