Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 09/02/1997
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 09/02/1997
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 09/02/1997
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/03/1997
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 09/03/1997
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 09/03/1997
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/03/1997
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 09/03/1997
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 09/16/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 09/30/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 10/29/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 11/12/1997
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 01/27/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/05/1998
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 03/31/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 04/21/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/23/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/04/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/06/1998