There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to authorize appropriations for refugee and entrant assistance for fiscal years 1998 and 1999.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/02/1997Became Public Law No: 105-136. (TXT | PDF)
12/02/1997Signed by President.
11/21/1997Presented to President.
11/13/1997Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to without objection.
10/01/1997Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 230 - 193 (Roll No. 482).
09/10/1997Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S9091)
09/10/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/02/1997Became Public Law No: 105-136. (TXT | PDF)
12/02/1997Signed by President.
11/21/1997SenatePresented to President.
11/13/1997-10:18pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/1997-10:18pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to without objection.
11/13/1997-10:18pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10943-10944)
11/13/1997-10:18pmHouseMr. Armey moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/04/1997SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S11683-11684)
10/01/1997-1:22pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays (2/3 required): 230 - 193 (Roll No. 482).
10/01/1997-12:58pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8291)
09/29/1997-12:16pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8061-8062)
09/29/1997-12:15pmHouseMr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/16/1997HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/11/1997HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
09/11/1997SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/11/1997-10:03amHouseReceived in the House.
09/10/1997SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9091)

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 09/10/1997
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 09/10/1997

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/11/1997 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims09/16/1997 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.1161.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1161. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (09/10/1997)

Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to authorize appropriations for refugee and entrant assistance.