Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI]* 09/16/1997
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 09/16/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 09/16/1997
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/24/1997
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 09/24/1997
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 09/24/1997
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 09/30/1997
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/08/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 10/27/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 02/04/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 02/04/1998
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 02/04/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/12/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 04/28/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/04/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/06/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 09/16/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/16/1998