Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 09/18/1997
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 09/18/1997
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 09/18/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 09/18/1997
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 09/18/1997
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 09/18/1997
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA]* 09/18/1997
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 09/18/1997
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 10/03/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 10/07/1997
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/20/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 11/07/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 11/08/1997
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/31/1998