There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Religious Workers Act of 1997

Short Titles as Introduced

Religious Workers Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

An Act to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to extend the special immigrant religious worker program, to amend the Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996 to extend the deadline for designation of an effective date for paperwork changes in the employer sanctions program, and to require the Secretary of State to waive or reduce the fee for application and issuance of a nonimmigrant visa for aliens coming to the United States for certain charitable purposes.

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Immigration and Nationality act to provide permanent authority for entry into the United States of certain religious workers.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
10/06/1997Became Public Law No: 105-54. (TXT | PDF)
10/06/1997Signed by President.
10/02/1997Presented to President.
10/01/1997Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to House amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S10305)
10/01/1997Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
09/18/1997Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/18/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (22)

Date Chamber
10/06/1997Became Public Law No: 105-54. (TXT | PDF)
10/06/1997Signed by President.
10/02/1997SenatePresented to President.
10/01/1997SenateSenate agreed to House amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10305)
10/01/1997SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendments to Senate bill.
10/01/1997-12:58pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/01/1997-12:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/01/1997-12:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
10/01/1997-12:55pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8290)
09/29/1997-12:14pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Traficant objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/29/1997-12:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
09/29/1997-12:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8060-8061)
09/29/1997-12:10pmHouseMr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/24/1997HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
09/22/1997HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
09/22/1997SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/22/1997-12:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/18/1997SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/18/1997SenateS.Amdt.1247 Amendment SP 1247 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/18/1997SenateS.Amdt.1247 Proposed by Senator Jeffords for Senator Hatch. To provide for waiver of fees for nonimmigrants engaged in certain charitable activities.
09/18/1997SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice.
09/18/1997SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9633-9635)

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary09/22/1997 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration and Claims09/24/1997 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (21)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1198. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/01/1997)

Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act to extend the special migrant religious worker program through October 1, 2000.

Directs the Secretary of State to waive or reduce the nonimmgrant visa fee for an alien coming to the United States to do charitable work.

Amends the Illegal Immigration Reform and Immigrant Responsibility Act of 1996 to extend the deadline by six months for certain paperwork revisions in the employer sanctions program.