There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Jump to: Summary | Actions Overview | All Actions | Titles | Subjects | Cosponsors | Committees | Related Bills

Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1228. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (11/09/1997)

50 States Commemorative Coin Program Act - Amends Federal law to mandate redesign of quarter-dollar coins issued during the ten-year period beginning 1999, with the reverse side emblematic of five of the 50 States each year during such period, selected in the order of their ratification of the U.S. Constitution or their admission to the Union.

United States $1 Coin Act of 1997 - Amends Federal law to mandate that the dollar coin shall: (1) be golden in color, have a distinctive edge, with tactile and visual features making it readily discernible; (2) be minted and fabricated in the United States; and (3) have similar metallic anticounterfeiting properties as U.S. clad coinage in circulation on the date of enactment of this Act.

Directs the Secretary of the Treasury to place into circulation $1 coins that comply with such mandate upon depletion of the Government's supply of $1 coins bearing the likeness of Susan B. Anthony.

Authorizes the Secretary to continue to mint and issue $1 Susan B. Anthony coins if they are depleted before production has begun of the new $1 coins mandated by this Act.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) adopt a marketing program promoting the use of $1 coins by commercial enterprises, mass transit authorities, and Federal, State, and local government agencies; and (2) conduct a marketing study and report its progress results to the Congress.

Directs the Secretary to mint and issue for a limited period ten-dollar gold coins, one-dollar silver coins, and half-dollar clad coins emblematic of the first flight of Orville and Wilbur Wright in Kitty Hawk, North Carolina, on December 17, 1903.

Precludes this Act from being construed as evidence of any intention to eliminate or limit the printing or circulation of United States currency in the $1 denomination.

Mandates prompt payment of all surcharges received from coin sales to the First Flight Foundation to: (1) maintain the Wright Brothers Monument on the Outer Banks of North Carolina; and (2) expand and maintain the visitor center and other facilities at the Wright Brothers National Memorial Park.


Actions Overview (7)

Date
12/01/1997 Became Public Law No: 105-124. (TXT | PDF)
12/01/1997 Signed by President.
11/19/1997 Presented to President.
11/13/1997 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
11/09/1997 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/31/1997 Committee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator D'Amato with an amendment. With written report No. 105-130. Additional views filed.
09/26/1997 Introduced in Senate

All Actions (23)

Date Chamber
12/01/1997 Became Public Law No: 105-124. (TXT | PDF)
12/01/1997 Signed by President.
11/19/1997 Senate Presented to President.
11/13/1997-1:03pm House Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/1997-1:03pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
11/13/1997-12:55pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
11/13/1997-12:55pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10800-10803)
11/13/1997-12:55pm House Mr. Castle moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/10/1997-12:50am House Held at the desk.
11/09/1997 Senate Message on Senate action sent to the House.
11/09/1997-11:49pm House Received in the House.
11/09/1997 Senate Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
11/09/1997 Senate The committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
11/09/1997 Senate S.Amdt.1632 Amendment SP 1632 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/09/1997 Senate S.Amdt.1632 Proposed by Senator Sessions for Senator Coats.
11/09/1997 Senate S.Amdt.1631 Amendment SP 1631 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/09/1997 Senate S.Amdt.1631 Proposed by Senator Sessions for Senator D'Amato.
11/09/1997 Senate Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S12430-12434)
10/31/1997 Senate Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 244.
10/31/1997 Senate Committee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator D'Amato with an amendment. With written report No. 105-130. Additional views filed.
Action By: Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs
10/23/1997 Senate Committee on Banking. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
Action By: Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs
09/26/1997 Senate Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.
09/26/1997 Senate Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S10060-10061)

Titles (8)

Short Titles:

Short Titles as Enacted:

50 States Commemorative Coin Program Act

Short Titles as Enacted for portions of this bill:
  • United States $1 Coin Act of 1997

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate:

50 States Commemorative Coin Program Act

Short Titles as Passed Senate for portions of this bill:
  • United States $1 Coin Act of 1997

Short Titles as Reported to Senate:

50 States Commemorative Coin Program Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate for portions of this bill:
  • United States $1 Coin Act of 1997

Short Titles as Introduced:

50 States Commemorative Coin Program Act

Official Titles:

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced:

A bill to provide for a 10-year circulating commemorative coin program to commemorate each of the 50 States, and for other purposes.


Subjects (37)

  • Aeronautics
  • Aircraft
  • Aircraft pilots
  • Anniversaries
  • Coins and coinage
  • Commemorations
  • Congressional reporting requirements
  • Copper
  • Counterfeiting
  • Foundations
  • Gold
  • Historic sites
  • History
  • Intellectual property
  • Inventors
  • Marketing
  • Mass rapid transit
  • Monetary policy
  • National monuments
  • National parks
  • North Carolina
  • Private aviation
  • Silver
  • State history
  • Statehood (American politics)
  • Women
  • Women's rights
  • Women's voting

Cosponsors (27)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs09/26/1997 Referred to
10/23/1997 Markup by
10/31/1997 Reported by S. Rept. 105-130

Related Bills (1)

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.