There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to increase the amount of private activity bonds which may be issued in each State, and to index such amount for inflation.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
10/03/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
10/03/1997Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate
10/03/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S10321)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 10/03/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 10/24/1997
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/24/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/24/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/24/1997
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/30/1997
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/30/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/31/1997
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/31/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/07/1997
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/07/1997
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 11/13/1997
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 11/13/1997
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 11/13/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 11/13/1997
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 01/29/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 01/29/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/02/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/24/1998
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/17/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/17/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/17/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/17/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/23/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/23/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 03/23/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/23/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/26/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/26/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/01/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/02/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/03/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/20/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 04/20/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/23/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/05/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/05/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 05/05/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/05/1998
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/12/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/19/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 06/04/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 06/04/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/09/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/09/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/19/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/22/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 06/22/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/09/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 07/10/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/14/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/15/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/23/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/31/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/15/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/08/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance10/03/1997 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (10)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1251. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (10/03/1997)

Amends the Internal Revenue Code to repeal the post-1987 reduction in the State ceiling on private activity bonds. Provides, beginning in 1999, for cost-of-living adjustments in the State ceiling on such bonds.