Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 10/03/1997
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 10/24/1997
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/24/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/24/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 10/24/1997
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/27/1997
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 10/28/1997
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/30/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/31/1997
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 10/31/1997
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/31/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/07/1997
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/07/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 11/07/1997
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 11/13/1997
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 11/13/1997
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 11/13/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 01/29/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/03/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/03/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 02/11/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/12/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 02/24/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/05/1998
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/17/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/17/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/17/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 03/17/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 03/23/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/23/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/23/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 03/23/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/26/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 04/03/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/20/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/23/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/30/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/05/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 05/06/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 05/06/1998
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 05/12/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 05/12/1998
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 05/14/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 05/14/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/14/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/14/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/19/1998
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 05/20/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 05/22/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/04/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/05/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 06/09/1998
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 06/09/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/09/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 06/11/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 06/15/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 06/19/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/22/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 07/07/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/07/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/07/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/08/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 07/23/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/29/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 09/15/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 10/08/1998