Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 10/06/1997
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 10/06/1997
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 10/06/1997
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 10/06/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 10/06/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 10/20/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/20/1997
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 10/20/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/28/1997
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 11/07/1997
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 02/10/1998