Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 10/07/1997
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 10/07/1997
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 10/07/1997
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 10/07/1997
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 10/07/1997
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 10/07/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 10/07/1997
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 10/07/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 10/07/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 10/07/1997
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 10/07/1997
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 10/07/1997
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 10/08/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 10/08/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 10/21/1997
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 10/22/1997
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 10/29/1997
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 10/30/1997
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 01/27/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 01/27/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 01/27/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 01/29/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/29/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 02/03/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/03/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 02/12/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/24/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/02/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 03/02/1998
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/04/1998
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 03/18/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/18/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/24/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/24/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 03/24/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/27/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/27/1998
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/21/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/21/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/05/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/11/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 05/13/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew