Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 10/09/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 10/09/1997
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 10/23/1997
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 10/23/1997
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/23/1997
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/23/1997
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 10/27/1997
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 10/27/1997
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 10/27/1997
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/30/1997
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 10/30/1997
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 11/04/1997
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 11/04/1997
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 11/12/1997
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 02/09/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/23/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 02/23/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/23/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/23/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/23/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 02/23/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 02/23/1998
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 02/23/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 02/23/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 02/23/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 02/23/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/23/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/23/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 02/23/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 02/23/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 02/23/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 02/23/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 02/23/1998
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 02/23/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 02/24/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/25/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/17/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/17/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 03/18/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/20/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 03/26/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/06/1998