Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 11/06/1997
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 11/06/1997
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 11/06/1997
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 11/06/1997
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 11/06/1997
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 11/06/1997
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 11/06/1997
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 11/06/1997
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/06/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 11/06/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 11/06/1997
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 11/06/1997
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 11/07/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 11/12/1997
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 11/13/1997
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/10/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew