Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 10/24/1997
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 10/30/1997
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/05/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 11/07/1997
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 11/13/1997
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 01/28/1998
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 01/28/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 01/28/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 01/28/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 01/28/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 01/28/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 01/28/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 01/28/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/28/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 01/28/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 01/28/1998
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 01/28/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 01/28/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 01/28/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 01/28/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 01/28/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 01/28/1998
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 01/28/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 01/28/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 01/28/1998
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 01/28/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 01/28/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 01/28/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 01/28/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 01/29/1998
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 01/29/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 01/29/1998
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 01/29/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/29/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 01/29/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 02/02/1998
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 02/03/1998
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 02/03/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 02/03/1998