Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 10/28/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 10/28/1997
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 10/28/1997
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/09/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/12/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 03/12/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 03/12/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 03/13/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 03/13/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 03/19/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/19/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 03/19/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/30/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 03/30/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/02/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 04/02/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/21/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/21/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 04/29/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 06/05/1998