Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 10/29/1997
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 10/31/1997
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 10/31/1997
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/31/1997
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 11/05/1997
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 11/07/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 11/10/1997
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 11/12/1997
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 11/13/1997
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 01/27/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 01/27/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 01/27/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 01/27/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 01/27/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 02/02/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 02/02/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/02/1998
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 02/03/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 02/09/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 02/09/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 02/11/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/23/1998
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 02/23/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/25/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 03/02/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 03/02/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/02/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/04/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/04/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/04/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 03/11/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 03/18/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 03/30/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 04/02/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/03/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 04/20/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/20/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 04/20/1998
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/20/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/20/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/21/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 04/22/1998
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 04/27/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/28/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 05/01/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 05/01/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 05/06/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/06/1998
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/11/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 05/13/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 05/13/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/14/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 05/21/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 06/04/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 06/19/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 09/01/1998