Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 11/13/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 11/13/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 02/04/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 02/05/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 02/11/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 02/12/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 02/24/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 02/24/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/03/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 03/04/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/29/1998
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 04/30/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 06/16/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 09/08/1998