Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 11/08/1997
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 03/05/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/11/1998
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/31/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/31/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/01/1998