Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 11/08/1997
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 01/29/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 05/22/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/09/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/09/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/09/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/29/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/29/1998
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 07/29/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/14/1998