Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/27/1998
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 01/27/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 03/23/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/16/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/17/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/20/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/02/1998