Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE]* 11/12/1997
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 04/20/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 04/23/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/06/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 05/06/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/07/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 05/08/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 05/11/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 10/20/1998