Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 01/21/1997
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 03/18/1997
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 10/28/1997
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 02/03/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/10/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 02/12/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/11/1998
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 03/27/1998