Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 11/13/1997
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA]* 11/13/1997
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 11/13/1997
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 11/13/1997
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 02/03/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 02/04/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 02/11/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/06/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/12/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/07/1998