Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 01/28/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 01/28/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 01/28/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 02/11/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/12/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 02/23/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/11/1998
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 04/28/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 05/11/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 06/02/1998
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 07/08/1998