Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT]* 02/04/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 02/04/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 02/05/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 02/10/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 02/11/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 02/11/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 02/12/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 02/23/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 02/27/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/04/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 03/12/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 03/13/1998