There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Tax Code Termination Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to terminate the Internal Revenue Code of 1986.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/25/1998Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
02/25/1998Referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate
02/25/1998Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S1003-1004)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (37)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 02/25/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 02/25/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 03/04/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 03/05/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 03/05/1998
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 03/05/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 03/10/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 03/10/1998
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY] 03/10/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 03/12/1998
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 03/12/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/12/1998
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 04/01/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 04/01/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance02/25/1998 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1673. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (02/25/1998)

Tax Code Termination Act - Prohibits the imposition of any tax by the Internal Revenue Code: (1) for any taxable year beginning after December 31, 2001; and (2) in the case of any tax not imposed on the basis of a taxable year, on any taxable event or for any period after December 31, 2001. Excepts the: (1) tax on self-employment income (chapter 2 of the Code); (2) Federal Insurance Contributions Act (chapter 21 of the Code); and (3) Railroad Retirement Tax Act (chapter 22 of the Code).

Declares that any new Federal tax system should be a simple and fair system.