Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Thomas, Craig [R-WY]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS]* 02/25/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 02/27/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 02/27/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 03/02/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 03/05/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/05/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV] 03/05/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 03/09/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 03/09/1998
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 03/16/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 03/19/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 03/19/1998
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 03/23/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 03/24/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 03/25/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 03/30/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 03/30/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 03/31/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 04/20/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 04/21/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 04/21/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 04/21/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 04/21/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/27/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 04/27/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/27/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/28/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 04/28/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/28/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 04/28/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 04/30/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/30/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 05/04/1998
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 05/11/1998
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 05/14/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/18/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 05/20/1998