Committees: S.1693 — 105th Congress (1997-1998)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources02/27/1998 Referred to
05/20/1998 Markup by
06/05/1998 Reported by S. Rept. 105-202
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Historic Preservation and Recreation03/02/1998 Referred to
05/14/1998 Hearings by
House Resources06/15/1998 Referred to
08/05/1998 Markup by
10/02/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-767
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands06/18/1998 Referred to
06/23/1998 Markup by
06/23/1998 Reported by