Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 02/27/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/17/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 03/17/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 05/06/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/18/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/13/1998