Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO]* 03/13/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/13/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 03/13/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/13/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 03/13/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/13/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 04/21/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 04/21/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/21/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 04/21/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 04/21/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/21/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 05/22/1998
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 05/22/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN] 05/22/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 07/15/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/22/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/24/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 07/27/1998
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 07/27/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/29/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/29/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 07/29/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/29/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/29/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/29/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/30/1998
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 07/30/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/30/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 07/31/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 07/31/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/31/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/31/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/31/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/31/1998