Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL]* 03/27/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 03/27/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO]* 03/27/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 03/27/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 03/30/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/31/1998
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 04/02/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 04/03/1998
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 04/03/1998
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE] 04/03/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 04/03/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 04/03/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 04/03/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 04/20/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 04/20/1998
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN] 09/09/1998