There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

U.S. Holocaust Assets Commission Act of 1998

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

U.S. Holocaust Assets Commission Act of 1998

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

U.S. Holocaust Assets Commission Act of 1998

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

U.S. Holocaust Assets Commission Act of 1998

Short Titles as Introduced

U.S. Holocaust Assets Commission Act of 1998

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish a commission to examine issues pertaining to the disposition of Holocaust-era assets in the United States before, during, and after World War II, and to make recommendations to the President on further action, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
06/23/1998Became Public Law No: 105-186. (TXT | PDF)
06/23/1998Signed by President.
06/18/1998Presented to President.
06/10/1998Resolving differences -- Senate actions: Senate agreed to the House amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6129)
06/09/1998Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
05/01/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/30/1998Committee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator D'Amato with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
04/01/1998Introduced in Senate

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
06/23/1998Became Public Law No: 105-186. (TXT | PDF)
06/23/1998Signed by President.
06/18/1998SenatePresented to President.
06/10/1998SenateSenate agreed to the House amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6129)
06/10/1998SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
06/09/1998-4:55pmHouseA similar measure H.R. 3662 was laid on the table without objection.
06/09/1998-4:55pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/09/1998-4:54pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
06/09/1998-4:54pmHouseThe House struck all after the enacting clause and inserted in lieu thereof the provisions of a similar measure H.R. 3662. Agreed to without objection.
06/09/1998-4:54pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H4271-4273)
06/09/1998-4:53pmHouseMr. Leach asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
05/04/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/04/1998-2:30pmHouseHeld at the desk.
05/04/1998-2:01pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/01/1998SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
05/01/1998SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
05/01/1998SenateS.Amdt.2335 Amendment SP 2335 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
05/01/1998SenateS.Amdt.2335 Proposed by Senator Kyl for Senator D'Amato. In the nature of a substitute.
05/01/1998SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4133-4136)
04/30/1998SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 351.
04/30/1998SenateCommittee on Banking. Reported to Senate by Senator D'Amato with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
04/29/1998SenateCommittee on Banking. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
04/01/1998SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking.
04/01/1998SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S2978-2979)

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs04/01/1998 Referred to
04/29/1998 Markup by
04/30/1998 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1900. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/09/1998)

U.S. Holocaust Assets Commission Act of 1998 - Establishes the Presidential Advisory Commission on Holocaust Assets in the United States to: (1) study and develop an historical record of the collection and disposition of specified assets of Holocaust victims in the possession or control of the Federal Government (including the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and any Federal reserve bank), after January 30, 1933 (including certain gold assets obtained by the Nazi government of Germany from governmental institutions in Nazi-occupied areas); (2) coordinate its activities with private and governmental entities (including the international Washington Conference on Holocaust-era Assets); (3) encourage the National Association of Insurance Commissioners to report on Holocaust-related claims practices of insurance companies doing business in the United States after January 30, 1933, that issued insurance policies to individuals on designated Holocaust-victim lists; (4) review comprehensively research conducted by other entities regarding such assets in the United States; and (5) report its recommendations to the President.

Instructs the President to report recommendations for action to the Congress.

Directs the Administrator of General Services, upon Commission request, to provide administrative support services on a reimbursable basis.

Authorizes appropriations for FY 1998 through 2000.