Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA]* 04/02/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Coats, Daniel [R-IN]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/02/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 04/20/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 04/20/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 04/30/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 04/30/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 04/30/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 05/04/1998
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 05/14/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 05/14/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/14/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 05/20/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/20/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 05/20/1998
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX] 05/22/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 06/02/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 06/02/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/02/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 06/04/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 06/04/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/09/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 06/09/1998
Sen. Nickles, Don [R-OK] 06/11/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 06/18/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 06/23/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 06/26/1998
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/26/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 06/26/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 07/07/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/09/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/13/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/13/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 07/21/1998
Sen. Stevens, Ted [R-AK] 07/22/1998
Sen. Kyl, Jon [R-AZ] 07/22/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/23/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 07/23/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 07/24/1998
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/28/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 08/31/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 08/31/1998
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 08/31/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 09/23/1998