Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 04/22/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 04/23/1998
Sen. Lugar, Richard G. [R-IN] 05/05/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 06/01/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/06/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 09/02/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 10/07/1998