Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 04/29/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 05/18/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 05/20/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/21/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 05/22/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 06/01/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/10/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/08/1998