There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Reclamation Wastewater and Groundwater Study and Facilities Act to authorize the Secretary of the Interior to participate in the design, planning, and construction of the Willow Lake Natural Treatment System Project for the reclamation and reuse of water, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
10/07/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11816)
10/07/1998By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 105-374.
09/25/1998Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
05/07/1998Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
10/08/1998HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
10/08/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/08/1998-10:22amHouseReceived in the House.
10/07/1998SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11816)
10/07/1998SenateBy Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 105-374.
09/25/1998SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 619.
09/25/1998SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
09/23/1998SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/16/1998SenateSubcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-624.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
06/05/1998SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
05/08/1998SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
05/07/1998SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
05/07/1998SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S4530)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/17/1998

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/07/1998 Referred to
09/23/1998 Markup by
09/25/1998 Reported by S. Rept. 105-374
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power05/08/1998 Referred to
06/16/1998 Hearings by
House Resources10/08/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2041.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2041. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/07/1998)

Amends the Reclamation Wastewater and Groundwater Study and Facilities Act to authorize the Secretary of the Interior to participate in the design, planning, and construction of the Willow Lake Natural Treatment System Project for the reclamation and reuse of wastewater within and outside of the service area of Salem, Oregon. Limits the Federal share of the cost of such project to 25 percent. Prohibits the Secretary from providing funds for project operation and maintenance.