Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 05/08/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA]* 05/08/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC]* 05/08/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK]* 05/08/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT]* 05/08/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE]* 05/08/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 05/19/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 06/02/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 06/02/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 09/02/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/02/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 09/02/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/02/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 10/14/1998