There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Corporate Subsidy Reform Commission Act of 1997

Short Titles as Introduced

Corporate Subsidy Reform Commission Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill a bill to review, reform, and terminate unnecessary and inequitable Federal subsidies.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/09/1997Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Thompson with amendments and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 105-107. Additional views filed.
01/28/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (6)

Date
10/09/1997Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 209.
Action By: Senate
10/09/1997Committee on Governmental Affairs. Reported to Senate by Senator Thompson with amendments and an amendment to the title. With written report No. 105-107. Additional views filed.
Action By: Committee on Governmental Affairs
05/22/1997Committee on Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
Action By: Committee on Governmental Affairs
02/13/1997Committee on Governmental Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-209.
Action By: Committee on Governmental Affairs
01/28/1997Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs.
Action By: Senate
01/28/1997Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S729-730)
Action By: Senate

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Governmental Affairs01/28/1997 Referred to
02/13/1997 Hearings by
05/22/1997 Markup by
10/09/1997 Reported by S. Rept. 105-107

No related bill information was received for S.207.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.207. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate with amendment(s) (10/09/1997)

Corporate Subsidy Reform Commission Act of 1997 - Defines the term "inequitable Federal subsidy." Establishes an independent Corporate Reform Commission to: (1) examine the programs and tax laws of the Federal Government and identify those that provide inequitable Federal subsidies; (2) review inequitable Federal subsidies; and (3) submit a report to the President and the Congress in order to ensure fairness and equity in the operation and application of such existing programs or tax laws. Directs the Commission to limit its recommendations to the termination or reform of payments, benefits, services, or tax advantages, rather than the termination of Federal agencies and departments. Authorizes the Comptroller General of the United States to provide assistance, including the detailing of employees, to the Commission in accordance with an agreement entered into with the Commission. Requires the Commission and the Comptroller General to consult with certain congressional committees before entering into such agreement. Authorizes appropriations to the Commission and the Comptroller General. Terminates the Commission on September 1, 1999.

Sets forth procedures for Federal departments and agencies, the Commission, and the President for making recommendations to terminate inequitable Federal subsidies. Provides a special review requirement for international trade programs. Sets forth requirements for Commission reports and for congressional consideration of any subsequent presidential recommendations.