There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

National Fish and Wildlife Foundation Establishment Act Amendments of 1998

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Fish and Wildlife Foundation Establishment Act Amendments of 1998

Short Titles as Introduced

National Fish and Wildlife Foundation Establishment Act Amendments of 1998

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize and amend the National Fish and Wildlife Foundation Establishment Act.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
10/12/1998Failed of passage/not agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by recorded vote (2/3 required): 153 - 248 (Roll No. 523).
10/06/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
06/25/1998Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee with amendments. With written report No. 105-224.
05/20/1998Introduced in Senate

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
10/21/1998HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
10/12/1998-7:26pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/12/1998-7:26pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Failed by recorded vote (2/3 required): 153 - 248 (Roll No. 523).
10/12/1998-7:18pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H10639-10640)
10/10/1998-6:15pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Miller (CA) objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
10/10/1998-6:10pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate.
10/10/1998-6:10pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H10475-10477)
10/10/1998-6:09pmHouseMr. Saxton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/07/1998-6:25pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/07/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/07/1998-10:03amHouseReceived in the House.
10/06/1998SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/06/1998SenateS.Amdt.3749 Amendment SP 3749 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/06/1998SenateS.Amdt.3749 Proposed by Senator Snowe for Senator Chafee. In the nature of a substitute.
10/06/1998SenateThe Committee amendments were withdrawn by Unanimous Consent.
10/06/1998SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S11639-11642)
06/25/1998SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 434.
06/25/1998SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Chafee with amendments. With written report No. 105-224.
05/21/1998SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
05/20/1998SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
05/20/1998SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5219-5220)

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works05/20/1998 Referred to
05/21/1998 Markup by
06/25/1998 Reported by S. Rept. 105-224
House Resources10/21/1998 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.2095. View summaries

Shown Here:
Failed of passage in House (10/12/1998)

National Fish and Wildlife Foundation Establishment Act Amendments of 1998 - Amends the National Fish and Wildlife Foundation Establishment Act (the Act) to expand the National Fish and Wildlife Foundation's authority to accept and administer private gifts within the Departments of Commerce and the Interior.

(Sec. 3) Increases the Foundation's Board of Directors from 15 to 25 members, including the Director of the United States Fish and Wildlife Service and the Under Secretary of Commerce for Oceans and Atmosphere.

(Sec. 4) Authorizes the Foundation to have its principal offices in Washington, D.C. (as currently provided), or in the bordering counties of Maryland and Virginia.

Sets forth conditions for the Foundation to: (1) acquire and convey property, including agency approval; and (2) invest and deposit Federal funds.

Revises provisions relating to agency approval of acquisitions of property and of conveyances and grants. Sets forth limitations relating to the Foundation's: (1) reconveyance of real property; and (2) expenditures for printing services or capital equipment.

Repeals an exemption from State or local government condemnation for Foundation lands, water, and interests valuable for fish and wildlife conservation or management.

Amends the Wild Bird Conservation Act of 1992 to repeal specified grant and audit provisions with respect to the Foundation.

(Sec. 5) Authorizes appropriations through FY 2003 for the Departments of Commerce and the Interior to carry out activities under the Act. Authorizes the Foundation to accept funds from a Federal agency under any other Federal law to further its conservation activities. Sets forth matching fund requirements.

Prohibits Foundation grants from being used for litigation expenses or for lobbying the Congress.

(Sec. 6) Declares that nothing in the Act authorizes the Foundation to perform any function for which authority is provided to the National Park Foundation by specified Federal law.