Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 06/05/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 06/05/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 06/09/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 06/09/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 06/09/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 06/11/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 06/11/1998
Sen. Smith, Bob [R-NH] 06/15/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 06/18/1998
Sen. Lott, Trent [R-MS] 07/09/1998
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 07/10/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 07/13/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/15/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/20/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/21/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/21/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/27/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 10/16/1998

Show cosponsors who withdrew