There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Pine River Project Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Pine River Project Conveyance Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Pine River Project Conveyance Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Secretary of the Interior to convey the facilities of the Pine River Project, to allow jurisdictional transfer of lands between the Department of Agriculture, Forest Service, and the Department of the Interior, Bureau of Reclamation, and the Bureau of Indian Affairs, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date
10/07/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S11817-11818)
10/07/1998By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 105-376.
09/25/1998Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/05/1998Introduced in Senate

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
10/08/1998HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
10/08/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/08/1998-10:22amHouseReceived in the House.
10/07/1998SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S11817-11818)
10/07/1998SenateBy Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 105-376.
09/25/1998SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 625.
09/25/1998SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/23/1998SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
06/16/1998SenateSubcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-624.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power
06/08/1998SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
06/08/1998SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Water and Power.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
06/05/1998SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
06/05/1998SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S5700-5701)

Cosponsors (0)

No cosponsors.


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/05/1998 Referred to
09/23/1998 Markup by
09/25/1998 Reported by S. Rept. 105-376
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power06/08/1998 Referred to
06/16/1998 Hearings by
House Resources10/08/1998 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2142. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/07/1998)

Pine River Project Conveyance Act - Authorizes the Secretary of the Interior to convey to the Pine River Irrigation District, Colorado, a specified interest of the Pine River Project (a water facilities project which includes the Vallecito Dam and Reservoir in Colorado, along with related easements and appurtenances). Extinguishes upon the conveyance date all current obligations between the District and: (1) the Bureau of Indian Affairs; and (2) the Bureau of Land Management. Requires the District to pay 50 percent of all title transfer costs. Authorizes the Secretary to convey a remaining fractional interest in such Project to the Southern Ute Indian Tribe of Colorado, pursuant to a specified memorandum of understanding.

Provides for: (1) the transfer of certain inundated lands along the Dam and Reservoir; and (2) appropriate administrative jurisdiction over such lands after such transfer.

Prohibits such conveyance until the completion of specified events, including compliance with applicable environmental laws, issuance of a statement by the Ute Tribe to the Secretary that their trust assets have been protected, execution of an agreement acceptable to the Secretary which limits the future liability of the United States relative to the operation of the Project, and development of a flood control plan by the Secretary of the Army which shall direct the District in the operation of the Vallecito Dam for such purpose. Directs the Secretary, if the transfer is not substantially completed within 18 months from the enactment of this Act, to report to specified congressional committees on the transfer's status, obstacles, and anticipated completion date.