There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Superfund Recycling Equity Act of 1998

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 to clarify liability under that Act for certain recycling transactions.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/16/1998Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
10/21/1998Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S12843-12844)
Action By: Senate
09/16/1998Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S10416-10417)
Action By: Senate
06/16/1998Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Action By: Senate
06/16/1998Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S6421-6422)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (64)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/16/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/07/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/07/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/07/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/07/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/13/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 07/13/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/13/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/13/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/21/1998
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/21/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/21/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/21/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/21/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 07/21/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 07/24/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/29/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/29/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 07/29/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/29/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/29/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/29/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/29/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/29/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/29/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/31/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/31/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 08/31/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 08/31/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/31/1998
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 08/31/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/03/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/03/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/03/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/03/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/09/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/10/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/10/1998
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 09/10/1998
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/10/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/10/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/10/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/15/1998
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/15/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/16/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/16/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/18/1998
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/21/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 09/21/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/24/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/24/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/24/1998
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/24/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/24/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/24/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/25/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/30/1998
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 10/01/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/01/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/05/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/07/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/07/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/07/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/21/1998

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works06/16/1998 Referred to

No related bill information was received for S.2180.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2180. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/16/1998)

Superfund Recycling Equity Act of 1998 - Amends the Comprehensive Environmental Response, Compensation, and Liability Act of 1980 to absolve persons (other than owners or operators) who arranged for the recycling of recyclable material from liability for environmental response actions.

Deems transactions involving scrap paper, plastic, glass, textiles, or rubber (other than whole tires) to be arranging for recycling if the person who arranged the transaction demonstrates that the following criteria were met: (1) the recyclable material met a commercial specification grade and a market existed for the material; (2) a substantial portion of the material was made available for use as a feedstock for the manufacture of a new saleable product; (3) the material (or product to be made from the material) could have been a replacement for a virgin raw material; and (4) with respect to transactions occurring 90 days after this Act's enactment, the person exercised reasonable care to determine that the facility where the material would be managed by another was in compliance with Federal, State, or local environmental laws or regulations.

Deems transactions involving scrap metal to be arranging for recycling if the person who arranged the transaction demonstrates that: (1) the criteria for scrap materials were met; (2) he or she complied with applicable standards regarding activities associated with the recycling of scrap metals; and (3) the scrap metal was not melted prior to the transaction.

Deems transactions involving spent lead-acid, nickel-cadmium, or other batteries to be arranging for recycling if the person involved demonstrates that: (1) the criteria for scrap materials were met; and (2) he or she complied with applicable Federal environmental regulations or standards regarding such batteries.

Makes the exemptions from liability under this Act inapplicable if the person: (1) had an objectively reasonable basis to believe at the time of the recycling transaction that the recyclable material would not be recycled or would be burned as fuel or for energy recovery or incineration or that the consuming facility was not in compliance with Federal, State, or local environmental laws or regulations; (2) had reason to believe that hazardous substances had been added to the material for purposes other than processing for recycling; or (3) failed to exercise reasonable care with respect to the management of the material. Makes such exemptions inapplicable if the recyclable material contained polychlorinated biphenyls in excess of 50 parts per million or any new Federal standard or if such material is an item of scrap paper containing, at the time of recycling, a concentration of a hazardous substance determined to present a significant human health or environmental risk.