Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD]* 06/16/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 07/07/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 07/07/1998
Sen. Sessions, Jeff [R-AL] 07/07/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 07/07/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/13/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 07/13/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV] 07/13/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/13/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 07/21/1998
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL] 07/21/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/21/1998
Sen. Thurmond, Strom [R-SC] 07/21/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC] 07/21/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 07/21/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 07/24/1998
Sen. Mack, Connie, III [R-FL] 07/29/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/29/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 07/29/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/29/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 07/29/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 07/29/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 07/29/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/29/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 07/29/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/31/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/31/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 08/31/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY] 08/31/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 08/31/1998
Sen. Gorton, Slade [R-WA] 08/31/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/03/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/03/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/03/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 09/03/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR] 09/09/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 09/10/1998
Sen. Frist, William H. [R-TN] 09/10/1998
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 09/10/1998
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/10/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA] 09/10/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/10/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/15/1998
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 09/15/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 09/16/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA] 09/16/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 09/18/1998
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 09/21/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 09/21/1998
Sen. Gregg, Judd [R-NH] 09/24/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/24/1998
Sen. Specter, Arlen [R-PA] 09/24/1998
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/24/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/24/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 09/24/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/25/1998
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD] 09/30/1998
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 10/01/1998
Sen. Jeffords, James M. [R-VT] 10/01/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 10/05/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 10/07/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 10/07/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 10/07/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 10/21/1998