Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 06/24/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE]* 06/24/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH]* 06/24/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH]* 06/24/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID]* 06/24/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 06/24/1998
Sen. Helms, Jesse [R-NC]* 06/24/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 06/24/1998
Sen. Roth Jr., William V. [R-DE]* 06/24/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 06/24/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 06/24/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 07/08/1998
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 07/08/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 07/08/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/15/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 07/23/1998
Sen. Bennett, Robert F. [R-UT] 07/30/1998
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 09/08/1998
Sen. McCain, John [R-AZ] 10/06/1998
Sen. Hatch, Orrin G. [R-UT] 10/08/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 10/09/1998