There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Federal Research Investment Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Federal Research Investment Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Research Investment Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for continuation of the Federal research investment in a fiscally sustainable way, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/08/1998Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S12052-12054)
10/02/1998Committee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-364.
06/25/1998Introduced in Senate

All Actions (19)

Date Chamber
10/27/1998HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment, and in addition to the Subcommittees on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection, Energy and Power, and Finance and Hazardous Materials, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
10/27/1998HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment, and in addition to the Subcommittees on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection, Energy and Power, and Finance and Hazardous Materials, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
10/27/1998HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment, and in addition to the Subcommittees on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection, Energy and Power, and Finance and Hazardous Materials, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
10/27/1998HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health and Environment, and in addition to the Subcommittees on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection, Energy and Power, and Finance and Hazardous Materials, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
10/21/1998HouseReferred to House Agriculture
10/21/1998HouseReferred to House Resources
10/21/1998HouseReferred to House National Security
10/21/1998HouseReferred to House Commerce
10/21/1998HouseReferred to House Science
10/21/1998HouseReferred to the Committee on Science, and in addition to the Committees on Commerce, National Security, Resources, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/09/1998-2:53pmHouseHeld at the desk.
10/09/1998SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/09/1998-9:03amHouseReceived in the House.
10/08/1998SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12052-12054)
10/02/1998SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 697.
10/02/1998SenateCommittee on Commerce. Reported to Senate by Senator McCain with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 105-364.
07/29/1998SenateCommittee on Commerce. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/26/1998SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S7292-7294)
06/25/1998SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.

Committees (6)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/25/1998 Referred to
07/29/1998 Markup by
10/02/1998 Reported by S. Rept. 105-364
House Science10/21/1998 Referred to
House Commerce10/21/1998 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Health and Environment10/27/1998 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Energy and Power10/27/1998 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Finance and Hazardous Materials10/27/1998 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection10/27/1998 Referred to
House National Security10/21/1998 Referred to
House Resources10/21/1998 Referred to
House Agriculture10/21/1998 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2217. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/08/1998)

Federal Research Investment Act - Calls for Federal funding levels for fundamental, scientific, and pre-competitive engineering research to be increased to equal approximately 2.6 percent of the total annual Federal budget. Authorizes appropriations for civilian research and development (R&D) within specified agencies for FY 1999 through 2010.

Directs the President to include with the annual budget request a report concerning Federal R&D program funding, future R&D strategies and targets, an analysis of funding levels across Federal agencies by funding methodology, and specific proposals for infrastructure development and R&D capacity building in States with less concentrated R&D resources.

Requires the Director of the Office of Science Technology Policy to enter in an agreement with the National Academy of Sciences to conduct a comprehensive study to develop methods for evaluating federally-funded R&D programs. Requires the Director of the Office of Management and Budget (OMB), based on study results, to promulgate one or more alternative forms for Federal R&D performance goals. Permits an agency head to apply such an alternative form without further authorization by OMB. Requires agency heads carrying out R&D activities, upon updating a strategic plan, to describe the current and future use of methods for determining an acceptable level of R&D success as recommended by the study. Authorizes appropriations for the study.

Requires the OMB Director, based upon program performance reports, to identify the civilian R&D program activities or components which do not meet an acceptable level of success as defined under current law. Directs the head of an agency, for each program activity or component identified as being below the acceptable level of success for two consecutive fiscal years, to: (1) submit to the appropriate congressional committees a concise statement of the steps that will be taken to bring such program into compliance with performance goals; or (2) terminate such program should compliance efforts fail. Requires the inclusion of any legislative changes needed to effectuate the steps contained in such statement.