Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV]* 06/25/1998
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM]* 06/25/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT]* 06/25/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT]* 06/25/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM]* 06/25/1998
Sen. Gramm, Phil [R-TX]* 06/25/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 06/25/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA] 07/13/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 07/13/1998
Sen. Moynihan, Daniel Patrick [D-NY] 07/13/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/22/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/22/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 07/24/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 07/24/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 07/28/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA] 07/29/1998
Sen. DeWine, Mike [R-OH] 07/29/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 07/29/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/29/1998
Sen. Hutchison, Kay Bailey [R-TX] 07/29/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL] 07/29/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC] 07/30/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/31/1998
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 09/08/1998
Sen. Ashcroft, John [R-MO] 09/08/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 09/08/1998
Sen. Warner, John [R-VA] 09/08/1998
Sen. Thompson, Fred [R-TN] 09/22/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI] 09/22/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA] 09/28/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD] 09/28/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 10/02/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 10/02/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI] 10/05/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 10/06/1998