Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 03/12/1997
Sen. Cochran, Thad [R-MS] 03/12/1997
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 03/12/1997
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 04/24/1997
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 05/19/1997
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND] 07/08/1997
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 09/17/1997
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 10/29/1997