Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Mikulski, Barbara A. [D-MD]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Smith, Gordon H. [R-OR]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Faircloth, Lauch [R-NC]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Inouye, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Santorum, Rick [R-PA]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Breaux, John B. [D-LA]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Durbin, Richard [D-IL]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Cleland, Max [D-GA]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Kennedy, Edward M. [D-MA]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Sarbanes, Paul S. [D-MD]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Boxer, Barbara [D-CA]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Ford, Wendell H. [D-KY]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Akaka, Daniel K. [D-HI]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Reid, Harry [D-NV]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Bryan, Richard H. [D-NV]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Levin, Carl [D-MI]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Graham, Bob [D-FL]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Wellstone, Paul D. [D-MN]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Dorgan, Byron L. [D-ND]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI]* 07/13/1998
Sen. Dodd, Christopher J. [D-CT] 07/14/1998
Sen. Hollings, Ernest F. [D-SC] 07/14/1998
Sen. Daschle, Thomas A. [D-SD] 07/15/1998
Sen. Harkin, Tom [D-IA] 07/15/1998
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 07/16/1998
Sen. Baucus, Max [D-MT] 07/20/1998
Sen. Craig, Larry E. [R-ID] 07/20/1998
Sen. Glenn, John H., Jr. [D-OH] 07/21/1998
Sen. Johnson, Tim [D-SD] 07/21/1998
Sen. Landrieu, Mary L. [D-LA] 07/22/1998
Sen. Moseley-Braun, Carol [D-IL] 07/23/1998
Sen. Torricelli, Robert G. [D-NJ] 07/27/1998
Sen. Bond, Christopher S. [R-MO] 07/30/1998
Sen. Kerry, John F. [D-MA] 07/30/1998
Sen. Bingaman, Jeff [D-NM] 07/31/1998
Sen. Lieberman, Joseph I. [D-CT] 09/01/1998
Sen. Conrad, Kent [D-ND] 09/01/1998
Sen. Kerrey, J. Robert [D-NE] 09/01/1998
Sen. Snowe, Olympia J. [R-ME] 09/01/1998
Sen. Robb, Charles S. [D-VA] 09/01/1998
Sen. Chafee, John H. [R-RI] 09/01/1998
Sen. Kempthorne, Dirk [R-ID] 09/01/1998
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/01/1998
Sen. Campbell, Ben Nighthorse [R-CO] 09/01/1998
Sen. Murkowski, Frank H. [R-AK] 09/01/1998
Sen. Burns, Conrad R. [R-MT] 09/01/1998
Sen. Hagel, Chuck [R-NE] 09/02/1998
Sen. Biden, Joseph R., Jr. [D-DE] 09/02/1998
Sen. Bumpers, Dale [D-AR] 09/03/1998
Sen. Byrd, Robert C. [D-WV] 09/08/1998
Sen. Rockefeller, John D., IV [D-WV] 09/08/1998
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 09/10/1998
Sen. Kohl, Herb [D-WI] 09/14/1998
Sen. Abraham, Spencer [R-MI] 09/15/1998
Sen. Feingold, Russell D. [D-WI] 09/16/1998
Sen. Brownback, Sam [R-KS] 09/24/1998
Sen. Allard, Wayne [R-CO] 09/24/1998
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/25/1998
Sen. Coverdell, Paul [R-GA] 09/30/1998
Sen. Grams, Rod [R-MN] 09/30/1998
Sen. Hutchinson, Tim [R-AR] 10/09/1998
Sen. D'Amato, Alfonse [R-NY] 10/14/1998