There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Cave and Karst Research Institute Act of 1998

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

National Cave and Karst Research Institute Act of 1997

Short Titles as Introduced

National Cave and Karst Research Institute Act of 1997

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish the National Cave and Karst Research Institute in the State of New Mexico, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/30/1998Became Public Law No: 105-325. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/1998Signed by President.
10/20/1998Presented to President.
10/10/1998Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.
04/28/1998Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-496.
07/11/1997Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S7317-7318)
06/26/1997Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 105-37.
01/29/1997Introduced in Senate

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber
10/30/1998Became Public Law No: 105-325. (TXT | PDF)
10/30/1998Signed by President.
10/20/1998SenatePresented to President.
10/10/1998-3:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/10/1998-3:05pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection.
10/10/1998-3:04pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H10424-10425)
10/10/1998-3:04pmHouseMr. Hansen asked unanimous consent to discharge the Committee of the Whole House on the State of the Union and consider.
04/28/1998HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 287.
04/28/1998HouseReported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 105-496.
03/25/1998HouseSubcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands Discharged.
03/25/1998HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
03/25/1998HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/17/1997HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Resources
07/15/1997HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
07/15/1997SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/15/1997-10:30amHouseReceived in the House.
07/11/1997SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7317-7318)
06/26/1997SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 95.
06/26/1997SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported to Senate by Senator Murkowski without amendment. With written report No. 105-37.
06/11/1997SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/23/1997SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources requested executive comment from Department of the Interior, and Office of Management and Budget.
05/21/1997SenateSubcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 105-121.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Historic Preservation and Recreation
01/30/1997SenateReferred to Subcommittee on Parks, Preservation and Recreation.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
01/29/1997SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
01/29/1997SenateSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR S815)

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lautenberg, Frank R. [D-NJ] 05/07/1997
Sen. Domenici, Pete V. [R-NM] 06/17/1997

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/29/1997 Referred to
06/11/1997 Markup by
06/26/1997 Reported by S. Rept. 105-37
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Historic Preservation and Recreation01/30/1997 Referred to
05/21/1997 Hearings by
House Resources07/15/1997 Referred to
03/25/1998 Markup by
04/28/1998 Reported by H. Rept. 105-496
House Resources Subcommittee on National Parks and Public Lands07/17/1997 Referred to
03/25/1998 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (14)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.231. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/29/1997)

National Cave and Karst Research Institute Act of 1997 - Requires the Secretary of the Interior, acting through the Director of the National Park Service, to establish the National Cave and Karst Research Institute in the vicinity and outside the boundaries of Carlsbad Caverns National Park, New Mexico.

Limits Federal funding to matching funds. Authorizes appropriations.